This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:59:29 (UTC).

Erik Solter et al v. Sports Warehouse et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Erik Solter filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sports Warehouse. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00460

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erik Solter

Lorne Bulling

Defendants

Running Warehouse, LLC

Skate Warehouse, LLC

Sports Warehouse a California corporation doing business as Tennis Warehouse

Tennis Warehouse

Wilderness Sports Warehouse LLC doing business as Tackle Warehouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Heikali

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Brittany L. Brown

Attorney at George Gesten McDonald PLLC

9897 Lake Worth Road, Suite 302

Lake Worth, FL 33467

David J. George

Attorney at George Gesten McDonald PLLC

9897 Lake Worth Road, Suite 302

Lake Worth, FL 33463

Joshua Nassir

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Lori G. Feldman

Attorney at George Gesten McDonald PLLC

102 Half Moon Bay Drive

Croton-On-Hudson, NY 10520

Michael M Liskow

Attorney at Calcaterra Pollack LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas Suite 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-5803

Ruhandy Glezakos

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Alyssa Sones

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1) On or before April 1, 2022, Defendants will file a single motion to compel arbitration directed to any or all plaintiffs in the above-titled cases, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 40 pages in length, which single motion and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants move to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s); 2) Within 45 days of the filing of Defendants' motion to compel arbitration, Plaintiffs may file a single response to that motion, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 40 pages in length, which single response and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants moved to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s); and 3) Within 30 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' response to the motion to compel arbitration, Defendants may file a single reply brief in support of that motion, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 25 pages in length, which single reply and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants moved to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s). (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed order ONLY to the Stipulation to Compel Arbitration #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: L.R. 58-10 at least 2 lines of text must accompany the Signature Line for Signature of Judge on a last page of proposed order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

34 #1

Proposed Order

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case called, zoom appearances made. The Court discusses the case status with counsel regarding the multiple related cases. Counsel is ordered to continue to confer with one another to streamline the case management. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich- zoom. (lc) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#32

(#32) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solte and designating Benjamin Heikali as local counsel #31 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

31 #1

Proposed Order

31 #31

Main Document

28 #28

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter, (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#1

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1) On or before April 1, 2022, Defendants will file a single motion to compel arbitration directed to any or all plaintiffs in the above-titled cases, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 40 pages in length, which single motion and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants move to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s); 2) Within 45 days of the filing of Defendants' motion to compel arbitration, Plaintiffs may file a single response to that motion, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 40 pages in length, which single response and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants moved to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s); and 3) Within 30 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' response to the motion to compel arbitration, Defendants may file a single reply brief in support of that motion, with a memorandum of points and authorities of up to 25 pages in length, which single reply and related filings will be filed in any of the related cases pending before this Court in which Defendants moved to compel arbitration of the plaintiff(s). (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed order ONLY to the Stipulation to Compel Arbitration #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: L.R. 58-10 at least 2 lines of text must accompany the Signature Line for Signature of Judge on a last page of proposed order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STIPULATION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Running Warehouse, LLC, Skate Warehouse, LLC, Sports Warehouse, Wilderness Sports Warehouse LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alyssa Sones added to party Running Warehouse, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa Sones added to party Skate Warehouse, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa Sones added to party Sports Warehouse(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa Sones added to party Wilderness Sports Warehouse LLC(pty:dft))(Sones, Alyssa) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case called, zoom appearances made. The Court discusses the case status with counsel regarding the multiple related cases. Counsel is ordered to continue to confer with one another to streamline the case management. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich- zoom. (lc) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solte and designating Benjamin Heikali as local counsel #31 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32695385) filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany L. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter and designating Benjamin Heikali as local counsel #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. George to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter and designating Benjamin Heikali as local counsel #27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany L. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32708608) filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. George to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32707832) filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter, (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lorne Bulling, Erik Solter. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32660440 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Erik Solter, Lorne Bulling. (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Lorne Bulling (pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Erik Solter (pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less