This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 09:42:37 (UTC).

Solorsano v. Steel Dynamics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Solorsano filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Steel Dynamics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Damon R Leichty and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano

Defendant

Steel Dynamics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

Anthony M Stites

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons USM285s

#2

#3

(#3) ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee on or before 10/21/2021. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee, this case will be subject to dismissal without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/28/2021.(mrm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Steel Dynamics, Inc..(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to reassign this matter to Judge Damon R. Leichty for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/19/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to reassign this matter to Judge Damon R. Leichty for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/19/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Steel Dynamics, Inc..(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee on or before 10/21/2021. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee, this case will be subject to dismissal without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/28/2021.(mrm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket**NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Steel Dynamics, Inc., filed by Sunamita Sanchez Solorsano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons USM285s)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEEL DYNAMICS, INC. is a litigant