This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 08:00:56 (UTC).

SOLMAN v. ZIMMER US INC et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 SOLMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ZIMMER US INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and JON D. LEVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY J SOLMAN

Defendants

ZIMMER INC

ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC

ZIMMER US INC

ZIMMER SURGICAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEVIN M. FITZGERALD

Attorney at FITZGERALD LAW GROUP

120 Exchange Street, Suite 200

Portland, ME 04101

ALEX C. DAVIS

Attorney at JONES WARD, PLC

1205 E. Washington Street, Suite 111

Louisville, KY 40206

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex C. Davis filed by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of NANCY J SOLMAN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1985204.) (FITZGERALD, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

3 #3

Zimmer-Biomet Holdings, Inc summons

3 #2

Zimmer, Inc summons

3 #1

Zimmer US, Inc summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Zimmer US, Inc summons, #2 Zimmer, Inc summons, #3 Zimmer-Biomet Holdings, Inc summons)(bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NANCY J SOLMAN. (Service of Process Deadline 5/30/2019) Fee due by 3/7/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Attorney ALEX C. DAVIS shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/13/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex C. Davis filed by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of NANCY J SOLMAN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1985204.) (FITZGERALD, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1984550.), filed by NANCY J SOLMAN.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Zimmer US, Inc summons, #2 Zimmer, Inc summons, #3 Zimmer-Biomet Holdings, Inc summons)(bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NANCY J SOLMAN. (Service of Process Deadline 5/30/2019) Fee due by 3/7/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.