Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:20:10 (UTC).

Soliz et al v. Emerson Electric Co., et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Soliz filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Emerson Electric Co . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09928

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judges

Karen Wells Roby

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessica Soliz

Alfred Soliz

Defendants

ITT LLC

Marathon Oil Company

General Electric Company

Goulds Pumps LLC

Texaco Inc

Shell Oil Company

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

El Paso Energy, E.S.T.

Emerson Electric Co

Exxon Mobil Corporation

ConocoPhillips Company

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

ChevronTexaco Corporation

ITT Water Technology, Inc.

Continental Oil Company

Bell & Gossett Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell F Tedesco

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius (Houston)

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Lauren Ann McCulloch

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius (Houston)

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Peter Sinnott Martin

Attorney at McCranie, Sistrunk, Anzelmo, Hardy, Mcdaniel (Covington)

195 Greenbriar Blvd., Suite 200

Covington, LA 70433

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey Anne Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly Lorraine Long

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lacey T McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Timothy Douglas Gray

Attorney at Forman Perry Watkins Krutz & Tardy, LLP

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michelle Miller Roy

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Gregory M. Anding

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Anthony M. Williams

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Anthony Joseph Lascaro

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Melissa Jade Shaffer

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Lexi T. Holinga

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Tyson B. Shofstahl

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

730 St. Charles Ave., Suite 301

New Orleans, LA 70130

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER: ORDERED that the above captioned cause is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 17-8977, Lopez v. McDermott, Inc., et al., of this Court pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 42(a). Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/10/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents two defendants in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: J. Fallon, MJ North, Case Mgr) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on May 6, 2019.(mp) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/3/2019. (NEF: MAG-4)(caa) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/2/2019.(ajn) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00139. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#15

(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 4/23/2019. GRANTED joint oral motion of venue transfer under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)to the Eastern District of Louisiana. GRANTED Plaintiff's oral motion to suspend the deadline for responding to the pending motions in this matter. Once the matter is returned to the Eastern District of Louisiana, counsel for Plaintiff shall contact the appropriate Judge to set a status conference to address discovery and set deadlines. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT Concerning Texas Paternity Action by All Plaintiffs. (Blackwell, Brian) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(f), the undersigned Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Middle District of Louisiana and the Eastern District of Louisiana hereby concur in and authorize the temporary assignment of United States Magistrate Judge Michael B. North of the Eastern District to perform the duties designated herein in the Middle District in connection with the captioned case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Chief Judge Nanette Jolivette Brown on 03/13/2019. (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal

#2

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/18/19. (Charles, Cherie) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B-2

1 #3

Exhibit B-1

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 675954. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1909647), filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Viator, John) Modified on 3/11/2019 to flatten attachment (KAH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/20/2019 as granted by rec doc 7 (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: ORDERED that the above captioned cause is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 17-8977, Lopez v. McDermott, Inc., et al., of this Court pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 42(a). Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/10/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents two defendants in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: J. Fallon, MJ North, Case Mgr) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on May 6, 2019.(mp) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/3/2019. (NEF: MAG-4)(caa) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/2/2019.(ajn) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00139. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 4/23/2019. GRANTED joint oral motion of venue transfer under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)to the Eastern District of Louisiana. GRANTED Plaintiff's oral motion to suspend the deadline for responding to the pending motions in this matter. Once the matter is returned to the Eastern District of Louisiana, counsel for Plaintiff shall contact the appropriate Judge to set a status conference to address discovery and set deadlines. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STATUS REPORT Concerning Texas Paternity Action by All Plaintiffs. (Blackwell, Brian) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by El Paso Energy E.S.T., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rossi, Alexandra) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2019. Court summarized procedural history. Counsel for Plaintiff informed Court of status. On or before 4/21/2019, briefs shall be filed. Telephone conference set for 4/23/2019 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for defendants responsible for coordinating call to the Court. (SGO) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add document(SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/18/19. (Charles, Cherie) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Texaco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(Viator, John) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Shofstahl, Tyson) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(f), the undersigned Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Middle District of Louisiana and the Eastern District of Louisiana hereby concur in and authorize the temporary assignment of United States Magistrate Judge Michael B. North of the Eastern District to perform the duties designated herein in the Middle District in connection with the captioned case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Chief Judge Nanette Jolivette Brown on 03/13/2019. (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal)(Viator, John) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 675954. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1909647), filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Viator, John) Modified on 3/11/2019 to flatten attachment (KAH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/20/2019 as granted by rec doc 7 (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL OIL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRONTEXACO is a litigant

Latest cases where BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY is a litigant