Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 10:37:16 (UTC).

Solas OLED, Ltd v. Samsung Display Co., Ltd,

Case Summary

On February 26, 2021, Solas OLED, Ltd (“Plaintiff” or “Solas”), represented by Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Display Co., Ltd. (“SDC” or “Defendant”), seeking damages and other relief under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for allegedly infringing Solas’s intellectual property relating to Display Apparatus. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant had infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Number 6,072,450, entitled “Display Apparatus,” owned by Solas (“Patent-in- Suit”).

 

Plaintiff alleged that “SDC has directly infringed (literally and equivalently) at least one claim of the ’450 patent by offering to sell, selling, and importing the Accused Products in the United States. SDC has infringed multiple claims of the ’450 patent, including independent claim 1. By way of example only, the SDC’s display modules included in the Apple MacBook Pro infringes an exemplary claim of the ’450 patent,” and that “SDC has induced, and continues to induce, infringement of the ’450 patent by actively encouraging Apple Inc. and entities associated with Apple Inc. to use, offer to sell, sell, and import the Accused Products. On information and belief, these acts include providing information and instructions on the use of the Accused Products; providing information, education and instructions supporting sales by Apple; providing the Accused Products to Apple; and indemnifying patent infringement within the United States.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “SDC has had knowledge of the ’450 patent from at least as early as 2006. In US 11/170,158 (published as US2006/0001363A1) (“Active matrix organic light emitting display device and method of fabricating the same”), published on January 5, 2006, assigned to “Samsung SDI Co., Ltd,” the ’450 patent was cited by the examiner of this patent application in a rejection of Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.’s claims issued on August 17, 2007. U.S. Patent No. 7,402,950 issued based upon this application on July 22, 2008 and cites the ’450 patent on its face. SDC has directly infringed (literally and equivalently) and induced others, including, Apple Incorporated, to infringe the ’450 patent and, unless enjoined, will continue to do so by making, using, selling, offering for sale, or importing products that infringe the claims of the ’450 patent and by inducing others to infringe the claims of the ’450 patent without a license or permission from Solas.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘450 Patent.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has infringed ‘450 Patent, for the Defendant to pay all damages provided for under 35 U.S.C. § 284, including compensatory damages, costs, expenses, and pre- and post-judgment interest for its alleged infringement. Plaintiff further requested the court to grant permanent injunction against Defendant from further acts of alleged infringement of the ’450 patent; to pass an order requiring SDC to provide an accounting and to pay supplemental damages to Solas along with costs for action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Solas OLED, Ltd

Defendant

Samsung Display Co., Ltd,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

T. John Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

P.O. Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Gregory S. Dovel

Attorney at Dovel & Luner LLP

201 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Sean A. Luner

Attorney at Dovel & Luner LLP

201 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Neil A. Rubin

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonas B. Jacobson

Attorney at Dovel & Luner LLP

201 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Samsung Display Co., Ltd,. (bw) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14535140), filed by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Samsung Display Co., Ltd,. (bw) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14535140), filed by Solas OLED, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solas OLED Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil A. Rubin