This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 09:05:28 (UTC).

Soileau v. Dillard Texas Four-Point, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Soileau filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dillard Texas Four-Point, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rose Soileau

Houston, TX 77058

Defendants

Dillard's, Inc.

Dillard Texas Four-Point, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clint E McGuire

Attorney at Martinez & McGuire PLLC

17227 Mercury Drive, Suite B

Houston, TX 77058

Defendant Attorney

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #3

Exhibit Original Petition (Louisiana)

1 #4

Exhibit Original Answer (State Court)

1 #5

Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court)

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REMAND granting #4 Agreed MOTION to Remand. This case is remanded to the 125th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. Case terminated on 02/08/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION to Remand by Dillard Texas Four-Point, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/04/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/02/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/02/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 12/02/2021. Discovery due by 01/18/2022. Mediation due by 04/06/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/17/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/17/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/06/2022. Docket Call set for 06/20/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District Court, Harris County, case number 2020-73641 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25827237) filed by Dillard's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Petition (Louisiana), #4 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #5 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DILLARD TEXAS FOUR-POINT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dillard's Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clint McGuire