This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:16:06 (UTC).

Soignet v. Ross

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Soignet filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Ross. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02418

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elmo Andrew Soignet, III

Defendant

Ricky Ross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas P Henican

Attorney at Riess Lemieux LLC

1100 Poydras St, Ste 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Monica Gaudioso

Attorney at Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

901 Main St, Suite 5500

Dallas, TX 75202

Thomas Patrick Henican

Attorney at Riess Lemieux LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Cathy L Altman

Attorney at Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

901 Main St, Suite 5500

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

John G Browning

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

5700 Granite Parkway, Suite 650

Plano, TX 75024

Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.

Attorney at Whitehead Law Firm

11909 Bricksome Ave., Suite W-3

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Ryan G Cole

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Ste 4800 West

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ricky Ross (Cole, Ryan) Modified docket text and linkage on 10/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#20

(#20) Appendix in Support filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re #18 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Motion to Transfer Venue (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#19

(#19) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re #18 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#17

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Designation of Local Counsel filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#12

No Description Available

#10

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ricky Ross. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amended Notice of Removal. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit(s)

#7

(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11114401) filed by Ricky Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jack K. Whitehead, Jr added to party Ricky Ross(pty:dft) (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case was removed from State Court on August 21, 2020. It has come to the Courts attention that Plaintiff's counsel, Thomas P Henican, is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)).Further, this Court requires Local Counsel. Within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must also designate local counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/25/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject-matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)(2) (2012). Defendant is ORDERED to amend his Removal within ten (10) days from the date this Order is signed. Failure to properly establish diversity jurisdiction will result in remand to state court without further notice. See FED. R. CIV. P. 12(h)(3) ("If the court determines at any time that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the court must dismiss the action."). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ricky Ross. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amended Notice of Removal. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/15/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ricky Ross (Cole, Ryan) Modified docket text and linkage on 10/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Appendix in Support filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re #18 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Motion to Transfer Venue (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re #18 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - Before the Court is Defendant Ricky Ross's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion"). Doc. No. 12). After careful consideration of the Motion and relevant caselaw, the Court DENIES the Motion as moot. The United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit has held that the Texas Citizens Participation Act ("TCPA") does not apply to diversity cases in federal court. Klocke v. Watson, 936 F.3d 240, 242 (5th Cir. 2019) ("[T]he TCPA does not apply to diversity cases in federal court."). The Court therefore DENIES the Motion as moot. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/21/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/18/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Designation of Local Counsel filed by Elmo Andrew Soignet, III (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ricky Ross. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amended Notice of Removal. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 5, 6. NEF Wed Aug 26 09:17:36 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11114401) filed by Ricky Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jack K. Whitehead, Jr added to party Ricky Ross(pty:dft) (Whitehead, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case was removed from State Court on August 21, 2020. It has come to the Courts attention that Plaintiff's counsel, Thomas P Henican, is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)).Further, this Court requires Local Counsel. Within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must also designate local counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/25/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendant, Ricky Ross, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendant's pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/25/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject-matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)(2) (2012). Defendant is ORDERED to amend his Removal within ten (10) days from the date this Order is signed. Failure to properly establish diversity jurisdiction will result in remand to state court without further notice. See FED. R. CIV. P. 12(h)(3) ("If the court determines at any time that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the court must dismiss the action."). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Aug 21 16:07:34 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ricky Ross. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ricky Ross. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11101642) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Browning, John) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Kenneth Whitehead, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John G Browning

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan G Cole