This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2020 at 07:04:34 (UTC).

SODORA v. WAWA, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 SODORA filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against WAWA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARMINE SODORA

Defendant

WAWA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AARON L. SCHWARTZ

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer

850 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#10

(#4) ORDERED THAT THE COURT REITERATES THAT IT INTENDS TO ADDRESS ONLY ADMINISTRATIVE AND/OR SCHEDULING ISSUES AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE CIVIL ACTION FLAG "19-6019-GEKP.". SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/17/2020. 1/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER: ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE THE TITLE OF THE CIVIL ACTION 19-6019 TO IN RE WAWA, INC. DATA BREACH LITIGATION. CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019 WILL HENCEFORTH BE THE "LEAD CASE." ANY AND ALL CASES RELATED TO CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019, THE LEAD CASE, FILED BEFORE, ON THE DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 (DOC. 9) IN C.A. 19-6019, SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.1(c) WITH AND PLACED ON THE DOCKET OF THE LEAD CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER ALL PARTIES TO THE DOCKET THE LEAD CASE WHO APPEAR IN ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES FILED BEFORE, ON THE DAME DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 IN THE LEAD CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ADD ALL COUNSEL TO THE DOCKET OF THE LEAD CASE WHO HAVE OR WILL HAVE ENTERED A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IN ANY AND ALL OF THE RELATED CASES FILED BEFORE, ON THE DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 IN C.A. NO. 19-6019. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES SUBJECT TO THIS STANDING ORDER WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ANY AND ALL CASES THAT HAVE BEEN DESIGNATED RELATED TO C.A. NO. 19-6019. THE CLERK SHALL PLACE THIS STANDING ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES MARKED WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/14/2020. 1/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR AN IN-PERSON PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/24/2020 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/14/2020. 1/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#11

(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE THE TITLE OF THE CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019 TO IN RE: WAWA, INC. DATA SECURITY LITIGATION. 19-6019 WILL CONTINUE TO THE BE THE LEAD CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE CIVIL ACTION FLAG "19-6019-GEKP". SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/3/2020. 2/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WAWA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209471.), filed by CARMINE SODORA.(bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#12

(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE CONFERRED AND SUBMITTED CANDIDATES FOR LEAD COUNSEL NO LATER THAN 2/19/2020 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE COURT INVITES SUBMISSION OF APPLICATIONS FOR POSITIONS OF MEMBERSHIP OR LEADERSHIP OF A STEERING COMMITTEE NO LATER THAN 2/19/2020. NO LATER THAN 2/26/2020 COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' MATERIALS SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH THE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL. ON 3/12/2020 AT 3:30PM THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL AND/OR A STEERING COMMITTEE(S). ALL FILINGS PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER SHALL BE FILED ON THE LEAD CASE DOCKET 19-6019. THE COURT SHALL STAY ALL RESPONSIVE DEADLINES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE CLERK SHALL ENTER THIS ORDER ON ALL DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE FLAG 19-6019-GEKP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/4/2020. 2/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE CONFERRED AND SUBMITTED CANDIDATES FOR LEAD COUNSEL NO LATER THAN 2/19/2020 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE COURT INVITES SUBMISSION OF APPLICATIONS FOR POSITIONS OF MEMBERSHIP OR LEADERSHIP OF A STEERING COMMITTEE NO LATER THAN 2/19/2020. NO LATER THAN 2/26/2020 COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' MATERIALS SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH THE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL. ON 3/12/2020 AT 3:30PM THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL AND/OR A STEERING COMMITTEE(S). ALL FILINGS PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER SHALL BE FILED ON THE LEAD CASE DOCKET 19-6019. THE COURT SHALL STAY ALL RESPONSIVE DEADLINES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE CLERK SHALL ENTER THIS ORDER ON ALL DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE FLAG 19-6019-GEKP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/4/2020. 2/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE THE TITLE OF THE CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019 TO IN RE: WAWA, INC. DATA SECURITY LITIGATION. 19-6019 WILL CONTINUE TO THE BE THE LEAD CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE CIVIL ACTION FLAG "19-6019-GEKP". SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/3/2020. 2/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED THAT THE COURT REITERATES THAT IT INTENDS TO ADDRESS ONLY ADMINISTRATIVE AND/OR SCHEDULING ISSUES AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE CIVIL ACTION FLAG "19-6019-GEKP.". SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/17/2020. 1/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR AN IN-PERSON PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/24/2020 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS MARKED WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/14/2020. 1/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER: ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE THE TITLE OF THE CIVIL ACTION 19-6019 TO IN RE WAWA, INC. DATA BREACH LITIGATION. CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019 WILL HENCEFORTH BE THE "LEAD CASE." ANY AND ALL CASES RELATED TO CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-6019, THE LEAD CASE, FILED BEFORE, ON THE DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 (DOC. 9) IN C.A. 19-6019, SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.1(c) WITH AND PLACED ON THE DOCKET OF THE LEAD CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER ALL PARTIES TO THE DOCKET THE LEAD CASE WHO APPEAR IN ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES FILED BEFORE, ON THE DAME DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 IN THE LEAD CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ADD ALL COUNSEL TO THE DOCKET OF THE LEAD CASE WHO HAVE OR WILL HAVE ENTERED A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IN ANY AND ALL OF THE RELATED CASES FILED BEFORE, ON THE DATE OF, OR AFTER THE DOCKETING OF THE COURT'S CONSOLIDATION ORDER OF 1/8/2020 IN C.A. NO. 19-6019. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES SUBJECT TO THIS STANDING ORDER WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ANY AND ALL CASES THAT HAVE BEEN DESIGNATED RELATED TO C.A. NO. 19-6019. THE CLERK SHALL PLACE THIS STANDING ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ANY AND ALL RELATED CASES MARKED WITH THE FLAG "19-6019-GEKP." ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/14/2020. 1/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket1 Summons Issued as to WAWA, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/8/20 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CARMINE SODORA. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WAWA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209471.), filed by CARMINE SODORA.(bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.