This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2020 at 08:57:25 (UTC).

Socolov v. State Of Utah

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Socolov filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State Of Utah. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01881

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oleg Socolov

Pahrump, NV 89060

Respondent

State Of Utah

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM to #1 -1 Petition by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (JQC) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Reconsider Detention by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. Responses due by 11/2/2020. (MR) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

Motion for Late Filing

1 #1

Petition for Habeas Corpus

#1

(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Late Filing, #3 Memorandum) (JQC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM to #1 -1 Petition by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (JQC) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Reconsider Detention by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. Responses due by 11/2/2020. (MR) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR : to ECF #1 -3 Memorandum was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Pro se Oleg Socolov.) CORRECTION: Filer is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. ECF #1 -3 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Late Filing, #3 Memorandum) (JQC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less