This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 11:27:46 (UTC).

Socolov v Attorney General of the State of Utah et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Socolov filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Attorney General of the State of Utah. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oleg Socolov

Pahrump, NV 89060

Respondents

Attorney General of the State of Utah

Utah Department of Corrections

Not Classified By Court

Prisoner Litigation Unit

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) MOTION to Proceed without Exhaustion of State Remedies filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Amended Petition

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Petition re: #1 Petition filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition, #2 Envelope)(kpf) Modified on to correct filing date 2/26/2021 (kpf). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

3 #2

Envelope

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) MOTION to Supplement the Record filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (alt) Modified on 2/9/2021 - Appendix was sealed due to personal information contents(jwt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2021: #2 Envelope) (jwt). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254, filed by Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(mh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #2

Envelope 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4681093190). (Originally received on 01/29/21) filed by Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (mh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Proceed without Exhaustion of State Remedies filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Petition re: #1 Petition filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition, #2 Envelope)(kpf) Modified on to correct filing date 2/26/2021 (kpf). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Supplement the Record filed by Petitioner Oleg Socolov (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (alt) Modified on 2/9/2021 - Appendix was sealed due to personal information contents(jwt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2021: #2 Envelope) (jwt). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254, filed by Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(mh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4681093190). (Originally received on 01/29/21) filed by Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (mh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Utah Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Prisoner Litigation Unit is a litigant