This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:34:50 (UTC).

Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03650

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province

National Spiritual Assembly of the Baha'is of the United States

Illinois Great Rivers Conference of the United Methodist Church

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Alejandro Mayorkas

Donna P Campagnolo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina Joan Murdoch

Attorney at Scott D. Pollock & Associates, P.C.

105 W. Madison Street, #2200

Chicago, IL 60602

Scott D. Pollock

Attorney at Scott D. Pollock & Associates

105 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Arthur Oswald

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Elizabeth Inez Treacy

Attorney at United States Attorney''s Office (NDIL-Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Donna P Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#6

(#6) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Donna P Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Donna P Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Donna P Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Clerk is directed to re-classify the nature of suit in this case to 440- Other Civil Rights and unseal all documents. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Donna P Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (daj, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois Great Rivers Conference of the United Methodist Church, National Spiritual Assembly of the Baha'is of the United States, Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province by Christina Joan Murdoch (Murdoch, Christina) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois Great Rivers Conference of the United Methodist Church, National Spiritual Assembly of the Baha'is of the United States, Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province by Scott D. Pollock (Pollock, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pollock, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Society of the Divine Word Chicago Province, Illinois Great Rivers Conference of the United Methodist Church, National Spiritual Assembly of the Baha'is of the United States; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18440072.(Pollock, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant