This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 07:10:45 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Sieva Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sieva Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-07526

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Sieva Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Sieva Networks, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

complaint

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for January 5, 2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Sieva Networks, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sieva Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16434958.). Filed bySocial Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin