This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2022 at 07:16:50 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Mojio USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2021 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mojio USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-08827

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mojio USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Rodeen Talebi

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

500 Arguello Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal re #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, FRCP 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2022) Modified on 1/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to McNabnay, Neil.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING UNOPPOSED #19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

19 #19

Main Document

16 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas

16 #16

Main Document

#12

(#22) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal re #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, FRCP 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2022) Modified on 1/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by December 20, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Mojio USA, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal re #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, FRCP 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2022) Modified on 1/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to McNabnay, Neil.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), See Docket No. #20 : Responses due by 1/24/2022 and Replies due by 2/7/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING UNOPPOSED #19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 22, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 15th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08827-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16740511.) filed by Mojio USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas)(McNabnay, Neil) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mojio USA, Inc... (Talebi, Rodeen) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/19/2021) (Entered: 12/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Mojio USA, Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by December 20, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Mojio USA, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mojio USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16624915.). Filed bySocial Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/14/2021) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodeen Talebi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay