This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:14:50 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. LocoNav, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LocoNav, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

LocoNav, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Reuben Ho-Yen Chen

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to LocoNav, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. LocoNav, Inc. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending the Date to Respond to the Complaint filed by LocoNav, Inc.. (Chen, Reuben) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent infringment (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending the Date to Respond to the Complaint filed by LocoNav, Inc.. (Chen, Reuben) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. LocoNav, Inc. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to LocoNav, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LocoNav, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16800370.). Filed bySocial Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reuben H. Chen