This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:58:26 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Location Based Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Location Based Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01536

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Location Based Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati PC

969 Hilgard Avenue No 1012

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Location Based Technologies, Inc.. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC, upon Defendant Location Based Technologies, Inc. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Huy Hguyen Aka Darin, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Location Based Technologies, Inc. answer now due 11/17/2021, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Report of Settlement (LR 16-15.7) filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 11/16/2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 12/17/2021. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 11/16/2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 12/17/2021. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Report of Settlement (LR 16-15.7) filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Location Based Technologies, Inc. answer now due 11/17/2021, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC, upon Defendant Location Based Technologies, Inc. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Huy Hguyen Aka Darin, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Location Based Technologies, Inc.. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure FRCP 7.1 of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32008463 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin