This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:21:08 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Keep Truckin, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Keep Truckin, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Keep Truckin, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Walls Homer

Attorney at Kelley Drye Warren LLP

7825 Fay Avenue, Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keep Truckin, Inc... (Homer, Andrew) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Walls Homer as counsel for Keep Truckin, Inc. (Homer, Andrew) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

16 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

16 #16

Main Document

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT KEEP TRUCKIN, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC, Keep Truckin, Inc. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT KEEP TRUCKIN, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#10

No Description Available

#8

#Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Re: #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Keep Truckin, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#19) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2022, 10:00 AM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 14, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Thi s is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keep Truckin, Inc... (Homer, Andrew) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Walls Homer as counsel for Keep Truckin, Inc. (Homer, Andrew) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Keep Truckin' shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT KEEP TRUCKIN, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC, Keep Truckin, Inc. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Page two reflects that the stipulation is signed only by plaintiff. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #11 Stipulation filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT KEEP TRUCKIN, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Re: #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Keep Truckin, Inc. served on 1/17/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Keep Truckin, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) for Patent Infringement against Keep Truckin, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-16800387). Filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/13/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W Homer