This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:16:11 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Jio, Inc.

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “SPIS”), represented by April Brandi Senter of Deadra Woods Stokes & Associates, P.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Jio, Inc. (“Defendant” or “Jio”), seeking injunctive relief as well as damages along with pre- and post-judgement interest for the alleged infringement of United States Patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Northern District of Illinois with Judge Charles P. Kocoras.

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 9,261,365 (“the ‘365 Patent”) entitled “Device, System and Method for Remotely Entering, Storing and Sharing Addresses for a Positional Information Device,” owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “Upon information and belief, Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 1, of the ‘365 Patent by making, using (at least by having its employees, or someone under Defendant's control, test the accused Product), importing, selling, and/or offering for sale associated hardware and software for asset locating services (e.g., Jio asset tracking platform, Jiobit, Jiobit for Families, and any associated hardware, apps, or other software) (“Product”) covered by at least Claim 1 of the ‘365 Patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged that, “The Product provides an asset tracking system for real-time GPS tracking of assets. A user can receive location information on a positional information device. The Product application installed on the requesting positional information device requests (from the server) the asset’s GPS location (i.e., at least one stored address stored). Before activating the tracker (i.e., the sending positional information device), a unique tracking device’s ID number or credentials (i.e., second identifier) needs to be added to the user’s account identified by the user login ID and password (i.e., the first identifier). Hence, the tracker device’s ID number or asset credentials (i.e., second identifier) is mapped to the user’s login ID (i.e., the first identifier) for tracking the real-time location (i.e., at least one stored address stored) of the asset.”

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe the ‘365 patent either directly or through acts of contributory infringement or inducement in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271. Defendant’s actions complained of herein are causing irreparable harm and monetary damage to Plaintiff.”

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff which deals with the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 9,261,365 owned by the plaintiff.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court for an order enjoining Defendant and all persons in active concert or participation with Defendant who receive notice of the order from further infringement, an award of damages resulting from Defendant’s infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with pre- and post-judgment interest. The plaintiff also requested the court to grant such further relief which the court finds that the plaintiff is entitled under law or equity.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04623

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Jio, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay B Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

Suite 13000, 1910 Pacific Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

April B Senter

Attorney at Senter Legal Services, Ltd.

19624 Governors Highway

Flossmoor, IL 60422

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

7.1 Disclosure Statement

1 #3

REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEM

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 10:40 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18760240. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC to continue the Telephonic Status Hearing (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for continuance #5 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 is reset to 12/21/2021 at 9:40 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #2 . Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for continuance #5 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 is reset to 12/21/2021 at 9:40 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #2 . Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC to continue the Telephonic Status Hearing (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18760240. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 10:40 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jio, Inc. (ak, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18617354. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Senter, April) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer April Brandi Senter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson