This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:59:20 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Global Tracking Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Global Tracking Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Global Tracking Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT Z. VIRUNI

Attorney at VIRUNI | LAW

100 International Drive, 23Rd Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Global Tracking Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9687442.), filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Report on Filing Patent)(VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

3 #1

Proposed Summons

3 #2

Report on Filing Patent

#4

(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Global Tracking Group, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) QC NOTICE: #3 Notice re Patent/Trademark Report Attachment #2. " **Please re-file the Report of the filing of Patent/Trademark using the event " Report on Filing Patent/Trademark" found in Civil Events under the heading of "Other Filings" in the Category "Other Documents". Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Global Tracking Group, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Report on Filing Patent)(VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDeficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 1/14/2022 (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC was filed incorrectly. No Summons or Civil Cover Sheet filed. File Summons and Civil Cover Sheet using the Notice entry. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Global Tracking Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9687442.), filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(VIRUNI, VINCENT) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant