This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:31:48 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Forward Thinking Systems LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Forward Thinking Systems LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne Y. Shields and Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Forward Thinking Systems LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson, PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Neil McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Neil McNabnay

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Noel F. Chakkalakal

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Order of Dismissal

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #21 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this Action are dismissed with prejudice and all counter-claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/15/2022. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Forward Thinking Systems LLC re #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15284463. Notice of Certificate of Good Standing (Chakkalakal, Noel) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

19 #1

Affidavit

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil McNabnay on behalf of Forward Thinking Systems LLC (notification declined or already on case) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

17 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

6 #1

Additional Quality Control Check Sheet

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. c/ecf U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal) (Coleman, Laurie) (Main Document 23 replaced on 2/16/2022) (Coleman, Laurie). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #21 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this Action are dismissed with prejudice and all counter-claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/15/2022. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/15/2022. (Minerva, Deanna) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Forward Thinking Systems LLC re #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15284463. Notice of Certificate of Good Standing (Chakkalakal, Noel) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER deferring ruling on #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) requires a certificate of the court for each of the states in which the applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. The application submitted fails to comply with this requirement. The applicant shall submit a certificate of good standing from each state in which he/she is admitted within two (2) weeks, at which time the Court will rule upon the application. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/14/2022. (Minerva, Deanna) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15284463. by Forward Thinking Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Chakkalakal, Noel) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil McNabnay on behalf of Forward Thinking Systems LLC (notification declined or already on case) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/10/2022. (Minerva, Deanna) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15276116. by Forward Thinking Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 1/14/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2022: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Forward Thinking Systems LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15182372, filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Was the Disclosure Statement Question on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Johnson, Jay) Modified on 1/14/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noel F. Chakkalakal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay