This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 09:50:11 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Exaktime, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Exaktime, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07312

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Exaktime, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Christopher Holloway

Attorney at Holloway Intellectual Property PLLC

535 16Th Avenue E

Seattle, WA 98112

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Exaktime, LLC. (jp) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Patent Asset Management as Corporate Parent. (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31970082 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attorney Brian Christopher Holloway added to party Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC(pty:pla))(Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Christopher Holloway