This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 08:15:12 (UTC).

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Click Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Click Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC

Defendant

Click Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbra Anne Stern

Attorney at Law Office of Barbra Stern PA

808 E. Las Olas Blvd., Suite 102

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Click Labs, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19084586) filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Stern, Barbra) Modified on 1/6/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Click Labs, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (BD) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

4 #1

Complaint

4 #2

Exhibit

#5

(#5) CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after any defendant appears for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/6/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Stern, Barbra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stern, Barbra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service executed on January 10, 2022 as to Click Labs, Inc. by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Stern, Barbra) Modified on 1/31/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service executed on January 10, 2022 as to Click Labs, Inc. by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Stern, Barbra) Modified on 1/31/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stern, Barbra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Stern, Barbra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after any defendant appears for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/6/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (BD) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Click Labs, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0036-KKM-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Click Labs, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19084586) filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Stern, Barbra) Modified on 1/6/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbra Anne Stern