This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 14:56:02 (UTC).

Snyder v. The Nebraska Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Snyder filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Nebraska Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M. Bazis and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Snyder

Defendants

Nebraska Medicine

The Nebraska Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cory R. Wilson

Attorney at ERICKSON, SEDERSTROM LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10330 Regency Parkway Drive, Suite 100

Omaha, NE 68114

Bonnie M. Boryca

Attorney at ERICKSON, SEDERSTROM LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10330 Regency Parkway Drive, Suite 100

Omaha, NE 68114

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost

Attorney at JACKSON, LEWIS LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10050 Regency Circle, Suite 400

Omaha, NE 68114

Sarah J. Millsap

Attorney at JACKSON, LEWIS LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10050 Regency Circle, Suite 400

Omaha, NE 68114

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

#13

#14

RESTRICTED

#15

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 2/19/21. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held by telephone with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 1, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #14 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #13 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Medicine, The Nebraska Medical Center.(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Serving Initial Disclosures by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Snyder (Boryca, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Cory R. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Snyder (Wilson, Cory) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska for Nebraska Medicine. by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Medicine, The Nebraska Medical Center, The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska.(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska for The Nebraska Medical Center. by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Defendants The Nebraska Medical Center, Nebraska Medicine, The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska.(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Nebraska Medicine, The Nebraska Medical Center (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendants Nebraska Medicine, The Nebraska Medical Center. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Carol Snyder from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 20-3070 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4166219) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Nebraska Medicine, The Nebraska Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Nebraska Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Richard Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonnie M. Boryca