This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:49:28 (UTC).

Snyder v. Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Snyder filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02148

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janet Snyder

Defendant

Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. trading & doing business as CenClear

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Charles Sipio

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Allison A. Barker

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road,

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

Ari R. Karpf

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorney

Janet Meub

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote, P.C

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5795070), filed by Janet Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A. Barker on behalf of Janet Snyder (Barker, Allison) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Janet Snyder. Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Karpf, Ari) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Meub on behalf of Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. (Meub, Janet) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Meub on behalf of Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. (Meub, Janet) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Janet Snyder. Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Karpf, Ari) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A. Barker on behalf of Janet Snyder (Barker, Allison) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cen-Clear Child Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5795070), filed by Janet Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less