This case was last updated from PACER on 07/30/2021 at 07:02:50 (UTC).

SNOWDEN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 SNOWDEN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OREN SNOWDEN

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Defendants

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

B. LAMMER

J DEAN

OFFICER SMITH

NURSE DECKER

COLE

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (KAA) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00854. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/28/2021. (jsy) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Oren Snowden to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Oren Snowden on 07/26/2021. Consent due by 8/16/2021 (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oren Snowden. (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Oren Snowden.(kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (KAA) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00854. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/28/2021. (jsy) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Snowden's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's trust fund account balance as of June 21, 2021 was $3,469.02 (Doc. #2 ). Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee no later than August 26, 2021. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/27/2021. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Oren Snowden to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Oren Snowden on 07/26/2021. Consent due by 8/16/2021 (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 21-854-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/26/2021. (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oren Snowden. (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Oren Snowden.(kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 7/29/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant