This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:24:50 (UTC).

Snow v. Selence Finance LP et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Snow filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Selence Finance LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. S. Ellis, III and John F. Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00410

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Snow

Stafford, VA 22554

Defendants

Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C.

MTGLQ Investors, L.P.

Selence Finance LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David Marshall Zobel

Attorney at Sykes Carnes Bourdon & Ahern PC

Pembroke One Building, 5Th Floor

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER that defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. All of plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter Rule 58 judgment in favor of defendants (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/6/19. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff on 5/6/19. (klau, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C.. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Selence Finance LP., MTGLQ Investors, L.P. & Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C. (Zobel, David) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add party filer (klau, ). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#12

(#12) Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #9 Notice of Appeal (rban, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Selence Finance LP. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 #2

Receipt

#11

(#11) USCA Case Number 19-1607 4th Circuit, Case Manager A. Walker for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Howard Snow. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit Final Order in 2018 Civil Action

1 #2

Exhibit state court complaint

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Stafford County Circuit ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6579518.), filed by Selence Finance LP., MTGLQ Investors, L.P. & Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C. (No Answer Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit state court complaint)(Zobel, David) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

9 #1

attachments

#10

(#10) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (klau, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Complaint in 2018 Civil Action

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #9 Notice of Appeal (rban, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) USCA Case Number 19-1607 4th Circuit, Case Manager A. Walker for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Howard Snow. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (klau, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Howard Snow. Filing fee $ 505. (Attachments: #1 attachments, #2 Receipt)(klau, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 58 in favor of defendants Selence Finance, LP, MTGLQ Investors, L.P. and Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C. and against plaintiff Howard Snow. Entered by Clerk on 5/6/19. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff.(klau, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. All of plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter Rule 58 judgment in favor of defendants (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/6/19. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff on 5/6/19. (klau, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C.., MTGLQ Investors, L.P. and Selene Finance LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in 2018 Civil Action, #2 Exhibit Final Order in 2018 Civil Action)(Zobel, David) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add party filer (klau, ). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Selence Finance LP., MTGLQ Investors, L.P. & Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C. (Zobel, David) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add party filer (klau, ). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C.. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Selence Finance LP. (Zobel, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Stafford County Circuit ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6579518.), filed by Selence Finance LP., MTGLQ Investors, L.P. & Sykes, Bourdon, Ahern & Levy, P.C. (No Answer Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit state court complaint)(Zobel, David) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.