This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 07:10:48 (UTC).

Snow v. Conagra Brands Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Snow filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Conagra Brands Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer L. Thurston and Erica P. Grosjean. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Thurston

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Snow

Defendant

Conagra Brands Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elias K. Fakhoury

Attorney at Hershey Law, P.C.

16255 Ventura Blvd, Ste. 1205

Encino, CA 91436

Johnny Rundell

Attorney at Hershey Law, P.C.

16255 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 1205

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Weissler

Attorney at Husch Blackwell

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Allison M. Scott

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP

300 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Conagra Brands Inc.. (Scott, Allison) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #3

VDRP

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Conagra Brands Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for JLT. (Scott, Allison) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Weissler on behalf of Conagra Brands Inc.. Attorney Weissler, Andrew J. added. (Weissler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Weissler on behalf of Conagra Brands Inc.. Attorney Weissler, Andrew J. added. (Weissler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Conagra Brands Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for JLT. (Scott, Allison) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorneys Elias K. Fakhoury, NCAED & Johnny Rundell, NCAED : Attorneys are DIRECTED to register for admission to the Eastern District of California. Please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Conagra Brands Inc.. (Scott, Allison) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, Stanislaus County, case number CV-22-001481 by Michelle Snow. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10273967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Scott, Allison) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J Weissler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison M. Scott