This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 09:22:38 (UTC).

Snider v. Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Snider filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement Savings Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00977

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Snider

Defendants

Lance Haffner

Gino DeMarco

Clint Clover

Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan

Christin Borden

Karl Blanchard

Linda Clark

Jerome Loughridge

Cary Baetz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L Colvin, III

Attorney at Latham Wagner Steele & Lehman PC - TULSA

10441 S Regal Blvd, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 73133

Bobby L Latham, Jr

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman Keele Ratcliff Freije & Carter - TULSA

1515 E 7Th St, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Mark G Boyko

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP - CLAYTON

8012 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 300

Clayton, MO 63105

Ryan T Jenny

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP - WASHINGTON DC

1054 31St Street Nw, Suite 230

Washington, DC 20007

Gregory Y Porter

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP - WASHINGTON DC

1054 31St Street Nw, Suite 230

Washington, DC 20007

Defendant Attorneys

Travis J Sales

Attorney at Baker & Botts LLP-HOUSTON

910 Louisiana St, One Shell Plaza

Houston, TX 77002

Tina Q Nguyen

Attorney at Baker & Botts LLP-HOUSTON

910 Louisiana St, One Shell Plaza

Houston, TX 77002

Spencer F Smith

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #5

Exhibit EX 5-Deposition of Christopher Snider

22 #4

Exhibit EX 4-Redline of Class Action Compliant

22 #3

Exhibit EX 3-Deposition Transcript of Kathleen Myers

22 #2

Exhibit EX 2-Email String with Pltfs Counsel

22 #1

Exhibit EX 1-Declaration of Travis J. Sales

#22

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

6 #1

Exhibit EX 1-Request for Admission

#6

5 #1

Exhibit Request for Admission

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY by Plaintiff Christopher Snider re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Brief in Support, #22 Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Gregory) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-Declaration of Travis J. Sales, #2 Exhibit EX 2-Email String with Pltfs Counsel, #3 Exhibit EX 3-Deposition Transcript of Kathleen Myers, #4 Exhibit EX 4-Redline of Class Action Compliant, #5 Exhibit EX 5-Deposition of Christopher Snider)(Smith, Spencer) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory Y Porter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Porter, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan T Jenny on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenny, Ryan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark G Boyko on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boyko, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENTRY of Appearance by Bobby L Latham, Jr on behalf of Christopher Snider (Latham, Bobby) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by James L Colvin, III on behalf of Christopher Snider (Colvin, James) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Brief in Support by Christopher Snider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latham, Bobby) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Y. Porter; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark G. Boyko; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan T. Jenny. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/13/2020. (mb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Tina Q Nguyen on behalf of All Defendants (Nguyen, Tina) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark G. Boyko Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3324137 by Christopher Snider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latham, Bobby) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Y. Porter Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3324135 by Christopher Snider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latham, Bobby) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3320342 by Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan, Cary Baetz, Karl Blanchard, Christin Borden, Linda Clark, Clint Clover, Gino DeMarco, Lance Haffner, Jerome Loughridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-Request for Admission)(Smith, Spencer) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3320336 by Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan, Cary Baetz, Karl Blanchard, Christin Borden, Linda Clark, Clint Clover, Gino DeMarco, Lance Haffner, Jerome Loughridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-Request for Admission)(Smith, Spencer) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3320328 by Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan, Cary Baetz, Karl Blanchard, Christin Borden, Linda Clark, Clint Clover, Gino DeMarco, Lance Haffner, Jerome Loughridge. (Smith, Spencer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2020: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission) (mb). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Order Regarding Deadlines for Responsive Pleadings and Briefing by Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan, Cary Baetz, Karl Blanchard, Christin Borden, Linda Clark, Clint Clover, Gino DeMarco, Lance Haffner, Jerome Loughridge. (Smith, Spencer) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of Administrative Committee Seventy Seven Energy Inc Retirement & Savings Plan, Cary Baetz, Karl Blanchard, Christin Borden, Linda Clark, Clint Clover, Gino DeMarco, Lance Haffner, Jerome Loughridge (Smith, Spencer) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/1/2020. (llg) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3304476. (Colvin, James) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Snider. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Colvin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bobby Leon Latham, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark George Boyko

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Y. Porter