This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 07:51:24 (UTC).

Snelling v. EnSite USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Snelling filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against EnSite USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02807

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Snelling

Defendant

EnSite USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Frank J. Mazzaferro

Attorney at Fitapelli & Shaffer, LLP

28 Liberty St, 30Th Fl

New York, NY 10005

Joseph A. Fitapelli

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer

28 Liberty Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorney

Marlene C Williams

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

1001 Fannin, Ste. 3700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Tolling Agreement

#2

#3

3 #1

Affidavit

#4

4 #1

Affidavit

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate

#9

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EnSite USA, Inc., filed.(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by EnSite USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EnSite USA, Inc., filed.(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Joseph Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Frank J Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Snelling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fitapelli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Snelling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EnSite USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EnSite USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26958467) filed by Jeffrey Snelling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tolling Agreement)(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EnSite USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlene C. Williams