This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2019 at 07:40:19 (UTC).

Sneed v. Life Time Fitness, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Sneed filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Life Time Fitness, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04042

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chrisshona Sneed

Houston, TX 77587

Defendants

Life Time Fitness, Inc.

Technogym USA Corp

Technogym Store USA

LFT Club Management Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Joseph Plezia

Attorney at Richard J Plezia Associates

2909 Hillcroft Ave, Ste 575

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Benjamin Novak

Attorney at Lorance Thompson PC

2900 N Loop W, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77092

Roger D Oppenheim

Attorney at Lorance Thompson PC

2900 N Loop W, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77092

Daniel Paul Buechler

Attorney at Thompson Coe et al LLP

700 N Pearl St, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Matters

1 #2

Exhibit List of Counsel of Record

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit

3 #2

Exhibit

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Technogym Store USA, Technogym USA Corp, filed.(Buechler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY in Support of #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(b)(6), filed by LFT Club Management Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Novak, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Novak on behalf of LFT Club Management Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc., filed. (Novak, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(b)(6) filed by Chrisshona Sneed. (Plezia, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Technogym Store USA, Technogym USA Corp, filed.(Buechler, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by LFT Club Management Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc., filed.(Novak, Scott) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(b)(6) by LFT Club Management Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Roger) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th Harris County, case number 2019-62467 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23380856) filed by Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters, #2 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Novak, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHNOGYM USA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard J. Plezia