This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:33:15 (UTC).

SNEDDON v. FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SNEDDON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01564

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLINE E. SNEDDON

Farmington, PA 15437

Defendants

FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT

BRIAN VANSICKLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Teresa O. Sirianni

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

Union Trust Building, Suite 700, 501 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Allison N. Genard

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Union Trust Building, 501 Grant Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 01/17/2020. A copy of this Notice and Memorandum Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison N. Genard on behalf of FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE. (Genard, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa O. Sirianni on behalf of FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN VANSICKLE. BRIAN VANSICKLE waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT. FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit C

9 #1

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS in Support of #3 Complaint by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

9 #6

Exhibit G

9 #5

Exhibit F

9 #4

Exhibit E

9 #3

Exhibit D

9 #7

Envelope

3 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE ), filed by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (cjo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 01/17/2020. A copy of this Notice and Memorandum Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison N. Genard on behalf of FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE. (Genard, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa O. Sirianni on behalf of FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN VANSICKLE. BRIAN VANSICKLE waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT. FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Sirianni, Teresa) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBITS in Support of #3 Complaint by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Remark: Order, Complaint Notice and Waiver Mailed Per Court Order on 12-23-19 to FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE. (cjo) Modified text on 1/2/2020. (ept) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRemark: Service copies forwarded to U.S. Marshals this date. (tjw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ENTERED that the United States Marshal serve by U.S. Postal Service First Class Mail a copy of the complaint, exhibits in support, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this Order to each defendant, as directed by plaintiff. Costs of service shall be borne by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/19/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/11/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXHIBITS in Support of #3 Complaint by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against FARMINGTON VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, BRIAN VANSICKLE ), filed by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (cjo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/06/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CAROLINE E. SNEDDON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.