This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2020 at 07:54:04 (UTC).

S.N. et al v. Mount Vernon School District

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 S N filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Mount Vernon School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-01912

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.N.

Defendant

Mount Vernon School District

165 N Columbus Ave

Mount Vernon, NY 10553

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Gutman

Attorney at Brill Legal Group, P.C.

64 Hilton Ave

Hempstead, NY 11550

Defendant Attorney

Thomas Scapoli

Attorney at Ingerman Smith, LLP (Harrison)

550 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 209

Harrison, NY 10528

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Thomas Scapoli, Esq dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Mount Vernon School District..(Scapoli, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Vernon School District..(jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mount Vernon School District, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.N...(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gutman, Mark) Modified on 3/5/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mount Vernon School District. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19000956)Document filed by S.N...(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Thomas Scapoli, Esq dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Mount Vernon School District..(Scapoli, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners S.N. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by S.N.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Vernon School District..(jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Gutman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: S.N.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was removed and added as party text. (jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mark Gutman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Gutman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party S.N. with party text 'individually'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mount Vernon School District, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.N...(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gutman, Mark) Modified on 3/5/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mount Vernon School District. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19000956)Document filed by S.N...(Gutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.N. is a litigant