This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:54:02 (UTC).

S.M.R Innovations LTD et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 S M R Innovations LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Motorola Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00592

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S.M.R Innovations LTD

Y.M.R Tech LTD

Defendant

Motorola Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortney S. Alexander

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Rodger Dallery Smith, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,699,223 B2; US 10,547,648 B2. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC on 5/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cortney S. Alexander - filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD, Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Y.M.R Tech LTD, S.M.R Innovations LTD. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2022 - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT Regarding Third-Party Funding by S.M.R Innovations LTD, Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#11

(#11) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#12

(#12) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT Regarding Third-Party Funding by S.M.R Innovations LTD, Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2022, filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Motorola Mobility LLC answer due 7/8/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/23/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2022 - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Y.M.R Tech LTD, S.M.R Innovations LTD. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Cortney S. Alexander for S.M.R Innovations LTD and Y.M.R Tech LTD added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cortney S. Alexander, filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD, S.M.R Innovations LTD. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/5/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cortney S. Alexander - filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD, Y.M.R Tech LTD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC on 5/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by S.M.R Innovations LTD. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,699,223 B2; US 10,547,648 B2. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Motorola Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3864867.) - filed by Y.M.R Tech LTD, S.M.R Innovations LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodger Dallery Smith, II