This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 07:19:16 (UTC).

Branislav Smolicek v. Plug Power Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Branislav Smolicek filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Plug Power Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02402

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Branislav Smolicek

Petitioners

Ashkan Shademan

Michael Burruso

Simon Gallagher

Thomas Dykes

Amolkumar D. Vaidya

J. Scott Hagen

David Clausing

Kurosh Bian

Patrick McGovern

Maryam Jahangir Hekmat

Dennis Torres

Martin Pinkney

Thomas J. Williams

Donghyuk Kim

Manfred Schumacher

Dorothy Anderson

Defendants

Paul B. Middleton

Andrew Marsh

Plug Power Inc.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Sophia Marie Rios

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

12544 High Bluff Drive Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92121

Melissa A Fortunato

Attorney at Bragar Eagel and Squire PC

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marion Curry Passmore

Attorney at Bragar Eagel and Squire PC

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jacob A Walker

Attorney at Block and Leviton LLP

260 Franklin Street Suite 1860

Boston, MA 02110

Daniel L. Germain

Attorney at Rosman and Germain LLP

16311 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1200

Encino, CA 91436-2152

Frank J Johnson

Attorney at Johnson Fistel LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Danielle S Myers

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Michael Albert

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Mario Man-Lung Choi

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1560

Oakland, CA 94612

Justin B Farar

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

12400 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 8460

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Laurence D King

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1560

Oakland, CA 94612

Avi N. Wagner

Attorney at Wagner Firm

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Laurence J. Hasson

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard LLP

10 East 40Th Street

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorney

Laura Alexandra Stoll

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 South Figueroa Street 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Other Attorneys

Adam C McCall

Attorney at Levi and Korsinsky LLP

445 South Figueroa Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Adam Marc Apton

Attorney at Levi and Korsinsky LLP

445 South Figueroa Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#61

#60

#59

#58

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) STIPULATION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Defendants Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoll, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc. (Stoll, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #12 filed by plaintiff Ashkan Shademan. (Rios, Sophia) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll on behalf of Defendants Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc. (Attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll added to party Andrew Marsh(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll added to party Paul B. Middleton(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll added to party Plug Power Inc.(pty:dft))(Stoll, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jeffrey P. Campisi on behalf of Movant Dennis Torres. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF DAVID CLAUSING AND SIMON GALLAGHER FOR APPOINTMENT AS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #34 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #26 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Appoinment of the Plug Shareholder Group as Lead Plaintiff pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Refort Act of 1995 (15 USC section 78u-4(a)(3)(B)); Approval of the Plug Shareholder Gro #22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel AND APPOINTMENT OF THE PLUG INVESTOR GROUP AS LEAD PLAINTIFF #38 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #29 filed by Movant Dennis Torres. (Farar, Justin) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laurence J. Hasson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Manfred Schumacher (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31288138) filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Manfred Schumacher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, L Hasson) (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peretz Bronstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laurence J. Hasson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Karissa J. Sauder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sophia Marie Rios on behalf of Movant Ashkan Shademan (Attorney Sophia Marie Rios added to party Ashkan Shademan(pty:mov))(Rios, Sophia) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peretz Bronstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton and Plug Power Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Branislav Smolicek, (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Branislav Smolicek. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Branislav Smolicek. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30942536 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Branislav Smolicek. (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Branislav Smolicek(pty:pla))(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLUG POWER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. McCall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam M. Apton