This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 08:12:08 (UTC).

Smoky War Dog LLC v. Hachette Book Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Smoky War Dog LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hachette Book Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00903

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smoky War Dog LLC

Defendants

Omega Ventures

Perseus Books, LLC

Hachette Book Group, Inc.

Damien Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sabrina J. Danielson

Attorney at Perkins Coie

1900 Sixteenth Street

Denver, CO 80202

Joshua A. Friedman

Attorney at Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland

1405 East Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

William C. Rava

Attorney at Perkins Coie

1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

John S. Cipolla

Attorney at Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland

1405 East Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant Attorneys

James A. Dimitrijevs

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Richik Sarkar

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - Cleveland

1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Elizabeth R. Emanuel

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - Cleveland

1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#15

#16

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder [non-document] The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Status Report filed June 17, 2021. Therein, Plaintiff indicates that it served Defendants Hachette Book Group and Perseus Books on May 11, 2021, and consented to an extension of time for those Defendants to file an Answer. The docket reflects that, on June 15, 2021, the parties filed a Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time until August 3, 2021 for these Defendants to file an Answer, which was granted by this Court. In light of the above, the Court is satisfied with Plaintiff's Response. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/21/2021. (P,K) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #13 . (Friedman, Joshua) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #14 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time until August 3, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/15/2021.(P,K) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hachette Livre USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Lagardere Group for Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC. (Sarkar, Richik) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Stipulated Motion for extension of time until August 3, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarkar, Richik) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order to Show Cause: For reasons set forth in this order, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit an appropriate application for entry of default and an affidavit in support thereof, or show cause why said Defendants should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/14/2021. (P,K) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return of Service by personal service executed upon Perseus Books, LLC on 5/5/2021, filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return of Service by personal service executed upon Hachette Book Group, Inc. on 5/5/2021, filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Omega Ventures waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Damien Lewis waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for attorney Sabrina J. Danielson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10816185, filed by Plaintiff Smoky War Dog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of PHV motion (Document does not contain an original signature.))(Friedman, Joshua) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (M,TL). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Sabrina J. Danielson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney William C. Rava. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate filing fee. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10809958 and AOHNDC-10809920, filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Cipolla, John) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Cipolla, John) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Cipolla, John) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10809958.. Filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Hachette, #4 Summons Perseus, #5 Summons Omega, #6 Summons Lewis) (Cipolla, John) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hachette Book Group USA Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A. Friedman(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina J. Danielson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John S. Cipolla(Designation Retained)