This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 08:57:45 (UTC).

Smokeware.net, LLC v. Premier Specialty Brands, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Smokeware net, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05058

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smokeware.net, LLC

Defendant

Premier Specialty Brands, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott P. Amy

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP Atl

Suite 1600E, 3200 Windy Hill Road, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Wesley Austin Roberts

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP Atl

Suite 1600E, 3200 Windy Hill Road, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Joseph Wendell Staley

Attorney at Thomas| Horstemeyer LLP

Suite 1800, 3333 Piedmont Road

Atlanta, GA 30305

Defendant Attorneys

William P. Eiselstein

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC - ATL

Suite 2100, 1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3407

Charles W. Forlidas

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC - ATL

Suite 2100, 1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3407

Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC - ATL

Suite 2100, 1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3407

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominus Masterbuilt Holdings, LLC for Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. Discovery ends on 9/15/2020.(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting the parties' #7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwiserespond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/11/19. (ddm) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Smokeware.net, LLC. Premier Specialty Brands, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Amy, Scott) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED AO 120 . (Amy, Scott) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/8/19. (bnw) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (ah) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Smokeware.net, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9066472). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/08/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by JPB. (bnw) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominus Masterbuilt Holdings, LLC for Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. Discovery ends on 9/15/2020.(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting the parties' #7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwiserespond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/11/19. (ddm) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed by Smokeware.net, LLC. Premier Specialty Brands, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Amy, Scott) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #5 A.O. Form 120. (ddm) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED AO 120 . (Amy, Scott) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/8/19. (bnw) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Premier Specialty Brands, LLC. (ah) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Smokeware.net, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9066472). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Specialty Brands, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott P Amy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley A Roberts