This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 08:45:20 (UTC).

Smith v. Wynne Transportation LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Wynne Transportation LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00818

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrell Smith

Defendants

Wynne Transportation, LLC

Wynne Transportation LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Ryan Vaught

Attorney at Nilges Draher Vaught PLLC

1910 Pacific Ave., Suite 9150

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Ellen Marie Bronchetti

Attorney at McDermott Will Emery LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nicole Nicole Figueroa

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

2501 North Harwood Street, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201-4629

Brian Alan Mead

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

444 West Lake Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brian Mead (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10872267) filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bronchetti, Ellen) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10870178) filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bronchetti, Ellen) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER: The court is advised by the clerk of court that Brian Alan Mead, Esquire and Ellen Marie Bronchetti, Esquire (collectively, "Counsel"), whose names appear on a pleading in this case, are not members of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, within 28 days of the date of this order, Counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership, or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/28/2020) (twd) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION to Continue Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Figueroa, Xenia) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before 6/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/24/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #1 Complaint filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Xenia Nicole Figueroa added to party Wynne Transportation LLC(pty:dft) (Figueroa, Xenia) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wynne Transportation LLC ; served on 4/10/2020. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Robin Miller

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Robin Miller on 04/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Robin Miller) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Llew Brown

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Llew Brown on 04/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Llew Brown) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Darrell Smith

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Darrell Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10753341) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Darrell Smith, #2 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Mead. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/29/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brian Mead (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10872267) filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bronchetti, Ellen) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Bronchetti. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/29/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10870178) filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bronchetti, Ellen) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The court is advised by the clerk of court that Brian Alan Mead, Esquire and Ellen Marie Bronchetti, Esquire (collectively, "Counsel"), whose names appear on a pleading in this case, are not members of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, within 28 days of the date of this order, Counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership, or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/28/2020) (twd) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. Responsive pleading due by 7/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/19/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Continue Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Wynne Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Figueroa, Xenia) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before 6/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/24/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #1 Complaint filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Xenia Nicole Figueroa added to party Wynne Transportation LLC(pty:dft) (Figueroa, Xenia) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wynne Transportation LLC ; served on 4/10/2020. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Robin Miller on 04/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Robin Miller) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Llew Brown on 04/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Llew Brown) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by James F. Gardetto on 04/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by James F. Gardetto) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wynne Transportation LLC. (oyh) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Darrell Smith. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darrell Smith. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Darrell Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10753341) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Darrell Smith, #2 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less