This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 08:18:10 (UTC).

Smith v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-11313

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laquita Smith

Rockwood, MI 48173

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quentin T. Docks

Attorney at Docks Law Firm

P.O. Box 204

Rockwood, MI 48173

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole M. Wright

Attorney at Zausmer, P.C.

32255 Northwestern Highway, Suite #225

Farmington Hills, MI 48334-1574

Brian D. King

Attorney at Zausmer, P.C.

32255 Northwestern Highway, Suite 225

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2021 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/7/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2022 10:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. King on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy *Counsel shall review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and file a joint discovery plan with the Court no later than 3 business days before the conference* (WBar) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Nicole) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit D - Email to Plaintiff's Attorney dated 05/05/21

1 #4

Exhibit C - Letter to Plaintiff's Attorney with Proposed Stipulated Order C

1 #3

Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal

1 #2

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2021-187437-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8487775 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit C - Letter to Plaintiff's Attorney with Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, #5 Exhibit D - Email to Plaintiff's Attorney dated 05/05/21) (Wright, Nicole) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2021 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/7/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2022 10:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2021 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. King on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy *Counsel shall review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and file a joint discovery plan with the Court no later than 3 business days before the conference* (WBar) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Nicole) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2021-187437-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8487775 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit C - Letter to Plaintiff's Attorney with Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, #5 Exhibit D - Email to Plaintiff's Attorney dated 05/05/21) (Wright, Nicole) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant