This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2023 at 10:36:10 (UTC).

SMITH v. WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 SMITH filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mario Garcia and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00575

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORY MARTEZ SMITH

Carlisle, IN 47838

Defendants

WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

CENTURION

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CENTURION, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (KAA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2022: #1 Complaint) (KAA). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

1 #1

Complaint

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

2 #1

Exhibits

2 #2

Envelope

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although the plaintiff is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee when able. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/21/2022. (TPS) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (JRB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (AAS) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTURION, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by CORY MARTEZ SMITH.(JRB) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint. The operative complaint in this matter is the amended complaint in the record as dkt. #9 . The Court will screen the amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A by separate entry. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/10/2023. (TPS) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint. The operative complaint in this matter is the amended complaint in the record as dkt. #9 . The Court will screen the amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A by separate entry. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/10/2023. (TPS) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTURION, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by CORY MARTEZ SMITH.(JRB) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (AAS) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (JRB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although the plaintiff is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee when able. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/21/2022. (TPS) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(KAA) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CENTURION, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by CORY MARTEZ SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (KAA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2022: #1 Complaint) (KAA). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less