This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:53:38 (UTC).

SMITH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Paradise Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00179

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Paradise Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN SMITH

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn Flaherty

Attorney at Flaherty Fardo Rogel & Amick, LLC

812 Ivy Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15232

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JONATHAN SMITH. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (DiPaola, Jaclyn) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JONATHAN SMITH. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (DiPaola, Jaclyn) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jd) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6601458), filed by JONATHAN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JONATHAN SMITH. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (DiPaola, Jaclyn) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JONATHAN SMITH. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (DiPaola, Jaclyn) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jd) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6601458), filed by JONATHAN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant