This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:18:09 (UTC).

Smith v. United States District Court et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against United States District Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Crow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03139

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Smith

Larned, KS 67550

Defendants and Interested Parties

United States District Court

Larned State Hospital

Justin (lnu)

Erica Brown

(fnu) Sohail

S. Joe

Virginia (lnu)

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED: Petitioner's correspondence is liberally construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal, and the motion #10 is granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/24/19. Mailed to pro se party Charles Smith by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis #2 & #5 are granted. Defendants Larned State Hospital and Joe S. are dismissed. The clerk of the court shall prepare a waiver of service form for the remaining defendants in the amended complaint pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to be served upon defendant at no cost to plaintiff. The report required herein shall be filed no later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order, unless the time is extended by the Court. The answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed thirty (30) days after the Martinez report is filed. The clerk of the court shall enter the Larned State Hospital as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report ordered herein. Upon the filing of that report, the Larned State Hospital may move for termination from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/19. Mailed to pro se party Charles Smith and Larned State Hospital by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant (fnu) Sohail; Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Justin (lnu); Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Virginia (lnu); Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Exhibits

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT (on court-approved form) filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Charles Smith by regular mail. Response deadline 8/28/2019. (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED: Petitioner's correspondence is liberally construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal, and the motion #10 is granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/24/19. Mailed to pro se party Charles Smith by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant (fnu) Sohail; Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Justin (lnu); Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Virginia (lnu); Return to Sender/Unable to Forward. (smnd) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendants Justin (lnu), Virginia (lnu), Erica Brown and (fnu) Sohail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis #2 & #5 are granted. Defendants Larned State Hospital and Joe S. are dismissed. The clerk of the court shall prepare a waiver of service form for the remaining defendants in the amended complaint pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to be served upon defendant at no cost to plaintiff. The report required herein shall be filed no later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order, unless the time is extended by the Court. The answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed thirty (30) days after the Martinez report is filed. The clerk of the court shall enter the Larned State Hospital as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report ordered herein. Upon the filing of that report, the Larned State Hospital may move for termination from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/19. Mailed to pro se party Charles Smith and Larned State Hospital by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles Smith. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) (smnd) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT (on court-approved form) filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Charles Smith by regular mail. Response deadline 8/28/2019. (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.