This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:56 (UTC).

Smith v. United States Attorney General

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Smith filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Soto and Bruce G Macdonald (PS). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Soto

Referral Judge

Bruce G Macdonald (PS)

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David Smith

Tucson, AZ 85734

Respondent

United States Attorney General

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by David Smith. (9 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) MOTION to File Brief by David Smith. (2 pages) (ARC) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC031588. (ARC) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDERED: that Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed. Petitioner's Motion to File Brief in Support (Doc. #5 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Although Petitioner has brought his claims in a 2241 petition, a certificate of appealability is required where a 2241 petition attacks the petitioner's conviction or sentence. In the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 2/20/2020. (MCO) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed February 21, 2020, this action is hereby dismissed. (MCO) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed February 21, 2020, this action is hereby dismissed. (MCO) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED: that Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed. Petitioner's Motion to File Brief in Support (Doc. #5 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Although Petitioner has brought his claims in a 2241 petition, a certificate of appealability is required where a 2241 petition attacks the petitioner's conviction or sentence. In the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 2/20/2020. (MCO) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC031588. (ARC) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to File Brief by David Smith. (2 pages) (ARC) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER: Honorable Judge Frank R. Zapata assigned in error. The case has been randomly assigned by the clerk to the Honorable Judge James A Soto. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-20-8-TUC-JAS(BGM). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by David Smith. (9 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.