This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2020 at 07:23:54 (UTC).

Richard Smith v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Richard Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09780

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Smith

Defendants

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina Marie Coleman

Attorney at Law Offices of Christina Coleman APC

5670 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

D Chad Anderton

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2050 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

Sara Ashley Zimmerman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2050 Main Street, Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM. (iv) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09780 MWF(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/14/2020. (ake) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on November 14, 2019. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Richard Smith; Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation; United States Parcel Service, Inc., a parent company of Defendant UPS;United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a parent company of Defendant;UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc., a parent company of Defendant UPS;The law firm of Christina M. Coleman, which represents Plaintiff; The law firm of Littler Mendelson, which represents Defendant. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying nited Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) as Corporate Parent. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #4

Declaration Dec of A.Hijar ISO Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Ex B to Dec of DCA ISO Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Ex A to Dec of DCA ISO Removal

1 #1

Declaration Dec of DCA ISO Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32461 Receipt No: 0973-24784539 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex A to Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex B to Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #4 Declaration Dec of A.Hijar ISO Removal) (Attorney D Chad Anderton added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM. (iv) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09780 MWF(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/14/2020. (ake) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on November 14, 2019. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, United Parcel Service, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Richard Smith. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Richard Smith; Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation; United States Parcel Service, Inc., a parent company of Defendant UPS;United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a parent company of Defendant;UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc., a parent company of Defendant UPS;The law firm of Christina M. Coleman, which represents Plaintiff; The law firm of Littler Mendelson, which represents Defendant. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying nited Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) as Corporate Parent. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32461 Receipt No: 0973-24784539 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex A to Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex B to Dec of DCA ISO Removal, #4 Declaration Dec of A.Hijar ISO Removal) (Attorney D Chad Anderton added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Anderton, D) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Marie Coleman