This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2019 at 07:21:00 (UTC).

Smith v. The Beneficient Company Group USA LLC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Beneficient Company Group USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02495

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Smith

Defendant

The Beneficient Company Group USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Leonard Scalise

Attorney at Ross & Scalise, P.C.

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Samantha Smith. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to The Beneficient Company Group USA LLC. (sre) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samantha Smith. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Samantha Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10354800) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#3

(#3) *PLEASE DISREGARD* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on US Attorney on October 21, 2019. (sre) Modified on 10/22/2019 (sre). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Terminated per #7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ykp) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Samantha Smith. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to The Beneficient Company Group USA LLC. (sre) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *PLEASE DISREGARD, ENTERED IN ERROR* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on US Attorney on October 21, 2019. (sre) Modified on 10/22/2019 (sre). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samantha Smith. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Samantha Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10354800) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *PLEASE DISREGARD* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on US Attorney on October 21, 2019. (sre) Modified on 10/22/2019 (sre). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Samples

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles L. Scalise