This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2023 at 08:30:51 (UTC).

Smith v. Syncreon.US, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Syncreon US, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cameron Smith

Defendant

Syncreon.US, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J. Bellwoar

Ryan R. Grace

Defendant Attorneys

Eileen K Keefe

Eve R. Keller

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 17th day of July, 2023, in light of the currently pending motion for summary judgment, Doc. 31, IT IS ORDERED THAT all case management deadlines set forth in the courts case management order, Doc. 19, are STAYED pending the resolution of Defendants motion for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/17/2023. (ve) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

#36

(#36) REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Syncreon.US, Inc..(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

35 #1

Statement Counter Statement of Facts

#35

(#35) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement Counter Statement of Facts)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

34 #1

Statement

#34

(#34) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#33

(#33) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement Counter Statement of Facts)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

31 #1

Proposed Order

#31

(#31) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Syncreon.US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT Cameron Smith against Syncreon Technology America, Inc., filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bellwoar, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (eo) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Amended Complaint Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT Cameron Smith against Syncreon Technology America, Inc., filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Complaint Cover Sheet)(Bellwoar, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Syncreon Technology America, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Syncreon Technology America, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5951386), filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 17th day of July, 2023, in light of the currently pending motion for summary judgment, Doc. 31, IT IS ORDERED THAT all case management deadlines set forth in the courts case management order, Doc. 19, are STAYED pending the resolution of Defendants motion for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/17/2023. (ve) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Syncreon.US, Inc..(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement Counter Statement of Facts)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Documents 33 & 34. An error occurs when opening the current documents. (aaa) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Statement Counter Statement of Facts)(Grace, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 30 deleted at request of counsel for defendant. Document 31 replaces document 30. (ll) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Syncreon.US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit(s) A-I, #3 Exhibit(s) J-N)(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Syncreon.US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/26/2023 (ve) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT:This case has been selected at random for mandatory referral to court annexed mediation in accordance with Standing Order 04-3. The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on September 9, 2022, at 8:45 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference and have all parties on the line prior to calling chambers at (717) 221-3970. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/18/2022. (ve) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen K Keefe on behalf of Syncreon Technology America, Inc. (Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Syncreon Technology America, Inc.. (Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eve R. Keller on behalf of Syncreon Technology America, Inc. (Keller, Eve) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cameron Smith. Syncreon Technology America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Bellwoar, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT Cameron Smith against Syncreon Technology America, Inc., filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bellwoar, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (eo) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT Cameron Smith against Syncreon Technology America, Inc., filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Complaint Cover Sheet)(Bellwoar, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Syncreon Technology America, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Syncreon Technology America, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5951386), filed by Cameron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less