This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 07:14:00 (UTC).

Smith v. Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Smith filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00620

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Smith

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Scai Holdings, LLC

UNITED HEALTHGROUP, INC.

Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah R. Marmor

Attorney at Scharf Banks Marmor LLC

333 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 450

Chicago, IL 60606

Stephanie Ann Scharf

Attorney at Scharf Banks Marmor LLC

333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 450

Chicago, IL 60606

William Rolf Olson

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm US, PC

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

Mary L. Russell

Attorney at Fine, Kaplan And Black, R.p.c.

1 South Broad Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Karen Halbert

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

Gerard Dever

Attorney at Fine, Kaplan And Black

1 South Broad Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Michael L. Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Gary M. Klinger

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

Roberta D. Liebenberg

Attorney at Fine, Kaplan and Black, R.P.C.

One South Broad Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Morgan Hunt

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: William R. Olson's motion to withdraw his appearance as counsel of record on behalf of Plaintiff #17 is granted. Attorney William Rolf Olson terminated. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#17

(#17) MOTION by Attorney William R. Olson to withdraw as attorney for Steven Smith. No party information provided (Olson, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:In light of the joint motion to reassign case pending before Judge Wood in Case No. 21-cv-305, the joint status report deadline of 4/6/2021 is stricken. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within seven business days of Judge Wood's ruling on the motion to reassign case. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

15 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER: Morgan Hunt's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Steven Smith #12 is granted. William R. Olson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Steven Smith #13 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/10/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17912804. (Olson, William) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17910658. (Hunt, Morgan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER: Gerard A. Dever's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #8 , Michael L. Roberts' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #9 , and Karen Sharp Halbert's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #10 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/8/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17907244. (Halbert, Karen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17907195. (Roberts, Mike) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17905475. Gerard A. Dever on behalf of Plaintiff (Liebenberg, Roberta) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Roberta D. Liebenberg's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #4 is granted. Mary L. Russell's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #5 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/4/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17894448. (Russell, Mary) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17894409. (Liebenberg, Roberta) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Sarah R. Marmor (Marmor, Sarah) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Stephanie Ann Scharf (Scharf, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: William R. Olson's motion to withdraw his appearance as counsel of record on behalf of Plaintiff #17 is granted. Attorney William Rolf Olson terminated. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION by Attorney William R. Olson to withdraw as attorney for Steven Smith. No party information provided (Olson, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:In light of the joint motion to reassign case pending before Judge Wood in Case No. 21-cv-305, the joint status report deadline of 4/6/2021 is stricken. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within seven business days of Judge Wood's ruling on the motion to reassign case. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Morgan Hunt's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Steven Smith #12 is granted. William R. Olson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Steven Smith #13 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/10/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17912804. (Olson, William) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17910658. (Hunt, Morgan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Gerard A. Dever's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #8 , Michael L. Roberts' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #9 , and Karen Sharp Halbert's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #10 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/8/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17907244. (Halbert, Karen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17907195. (Roberts, Mike) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17905475. Gerard A. Dever on behalf of Plaintiff (Liebenberg, Roberta) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Roberta D. Liebenberg's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #4 is granted. Mary L. Russell's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #5 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/4/2021. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17894448. (Russell, Mary) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17894409. (Liebenberg, Roberta) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Sarah R. Marmor (Marmor, Sarah) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Smith by Stephanie Ann Scharf (Scharf, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Steven Smith; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17892495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet and Attachment)(Scharf, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scai Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTH GROUP AND ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Rolf Olson