This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:18 (UTC).

Smith v. Street et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Street. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Ott and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Ott

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony Lee Smith

Springville, AL 35146

Defendants

Fred Lawton, III

Malcolm B Street, Jr

Kim McCarson

Eric Neal Snyder

Carol Lynn Hammond

Jacob Argo

Lewis Lafoy

Brett Williams

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, Jacob Argo, Brett Williams, Lewis Lafoy, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KAM) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Prisoner Consent Form filed by Tony Lee Smith. (KAM) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Lee Smith. (KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO AMEND - plaintiff must correct the deficient complaint within 20 days as set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/30/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Tony Lee Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, Jacob Argo, Brett Williams, Lewis Lafoy, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KAM) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Tony Lee Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO AMEND - plaintiff must correct the deficient complaint within 20 days as set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/18/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Consent Form filed by Tony Lee Smith. (KAM) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/30/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Lee Smith. (KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Lynn Hammond, Fred Lawton, III, Kim McCarson, Eric Neal Snyder, Malcolm B Street, Jr, filed by Tony Lee Smith.(KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less