This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 07:52:52 (UTC).

Smith v. Starr et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 Smith filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Starr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilhelmina M. Wright and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-02030

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakisha S Smith

Waseca, MN 56093

Defendants

Mistelle Starr

Dr. Reyna

Mr. McIntosh

Mr. Vaught

Captain Koch

Mrs. Hillsman

Mr. Parrent

Mrs. Hiller

Ms. Loderhose

Ms. Kozvolek

Mr. Levisay

Mr. Buethel

Mr. Jensen

Mr. Linnes

Mr. Ore

Ms. Guth

Mr. Wurdeman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Lakisha Smith (JGK) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit(s)

4 #2

Envelope

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT re #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lakisha S Smith.(MKB)Qc'd (KNK). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/13/2022. (TJB) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#7

(#7) RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000294 in the amount of $131.00 issued to Lakisha S Smith. (MKB) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 22-cv-2315 (JRT/JFD) has been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/4/2022 and Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/5/2022.(ABR) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 22-cv-2315 (JRT/JFD) has been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/4/2022 and Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/5/2022.(ABR) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000294 in the amount of $131.00 issued to Lakisha S Smith. (MKB) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/13/2022. (TJB) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXHIBIT re #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lakisha S Smith.(MKB)Qc'd (KNK). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lakisha S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MKB) Qc'd (KNK). (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Lakisha Smith (JGK) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Buethel, Guth, Hiller, Hillsman, Jensen, Koch, Kozvolek, Levisay, Linnes, Loderhose, McIntosh, Ore, Parrent, Reyna, Mistelle Starr, Vaught, Wurdeman filed by Lakisha S Smith. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 10/5/2022 (MTB). (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reyna Salmeron, as Preffered P.R. of the Estate of Maria Simon is a litigant