This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 14:36:44 (UTC).

Smith v. Smithfield Foods

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Smithfield Foods. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Beach Smith and Douglas E. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Beach Smith

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samarah Williams

Paul Macon

Sydney Davis

Carnelias Jenkins

Jessica Smith

Zachary Thompson

Tamesha Gholston

Windell Withers

Alfonzo Mack

DeAndre Dabney

Luchrisha Hilliard

Stephanie Randolph

Christian Golightly

David Kolb

Douglas Harvey Grant

Defendants

Inc. Smithfield Foods

Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp.

Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.

Smithfield Distribution, LLC

Smithfield Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Richard Theuer

Attorney at James R. Theuer, PLLC

555 E. Main St., Suite 1212

Norfolk, VA 23510

Anthony James Lazzaro

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, 34555 Chagrin Blvd, Suite 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Chastity Lynn Christy

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, 34555 Chagrin Blvd, Suite 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Lori Marie Griffin

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, 34555 Chagrin Blvd, Suite 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Chase Samples

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P. C. (SC-NA)

15 South Main St, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

D. Christopher Lauderdale

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P. C. (SC-NA)

15 South Main St, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

Shaun Michael Bennett

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (Norfolk - Main St)

500 E. Main St, Suite 800

Norfolk, VA 23510

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#33

32 #1

Attachment

#32

31 #1

Attachment

#31

#30

#29

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Pro hac vice for Thomas Chase Samples as to Smithfield Distribution, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. and Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 6/7/21. (tlev, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro hac vice for D. Christopher Lauderdale as to Smithfield Distribution, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. and Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 6/7/21. (tlev, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Bennett, Shaun) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to Complaint by Smithfield Foods, Inc..(Bennett, Shaun) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Christopher Lauderdale and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun M. Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7823563. by Smithfield Distribution, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Bennett, Shaun) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Chase Samples and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun M. Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7823537. by Smithfield Distribution, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Bennett, Shaun) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Smith, Christian Golightly, David Kolb. Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Theuer, James) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Smith, Christian Golightly, David Kolb. Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Theuer, James) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Smith, Christian Golightly, David Kolb. Smithfield Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Theuer, James) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Distribution, LLC, Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp., filed by David Kolb, Jessica Smith, Christian Golightly.(Theuer, James) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction re 8 Proposed Summons. The summons is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly and refile using the Proposed Summons event. (epri, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jessica Smith. (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Samarah Williams (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Zachary Thompson (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Paul Macon (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Carnelias Jenkins (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Sydney Davis (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by James Richard Theuer on behalf of Jessica Smith (Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7722907.), filed by Jessica Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Theuer, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smithfield Distribution, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Smithfield Foods & More; DBA : Smithfield Farmland a North Carolina Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Smithfield Foods, Inc. is a litigant