This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2020 at 09:06:35 (UTC).

Smith v. Smith

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01033

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin A. Smith

Defendant

Hailey B. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey P. Boyd

Attorney at BOREN AND BOYD, PLC

114 South Liberty Street

Jackson, TN 38301

Defendant Attorney

Jay G. Bush

Attorney at CLAYTON-LITTLE, PLLC

325 A North Parkway

Jackson, TN 38305

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Defendant Hailey B. Smith's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Hailey B. Smith.(Bush, Jay) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#14

(#14) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see attached for important instructions. (ars) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay G. Bush on behalf of Hailey B. Smith (Bush, Jay) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hailey B. Smith, filed by Justin A. Smith.(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST #9 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/5/2020. (mbm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Amend/Correct proposed Order submitted by Justin A. Smith. (Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Receipt of Service

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Justin A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt of Service)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Hailey B. Smith. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Summons by Jeffrey P. Boyd on behalf of Justin A. Smith. (Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #2

Summons for Hailey B. Smith

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for monetary damages against Hailey B. Smith (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3277736), filed by Justin A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Hailey B. Smith)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant Hailey B. Smith's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Hailey B. Smith.(Bush, Jay) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see attached for important instructions. (ars) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#13) SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 04/08/2020, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay G. Bush on behalf of Hailey B. Smith (Bush, Jay) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hailey B. Smith, filed by Justin A. Smith.(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST #9 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/5/2020. (mbm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION to Amend/Correct proposed Order submitted by Justin A. Smith. (Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Justin A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt of Service)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Hailey B. Smith. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons by Jeffrey P. Boyd on behalf of Justin A. Smith. (Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for monetary damages against Hailey B. Smith (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3277736), filed by Justin A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Hailey B. Smith)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less