This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:20:08 (UTC).

SMITH v. SAVINO et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 SMITH filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against SAVINO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02901

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN SMITH

Knox, IN 46534

Defendants

SAVINO

WEXFORD

CENTERION HEALTH SERVICES

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through January 10, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Envelope

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff RYAN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for RYAN SMITH. 635 N. 1025 E. Knox, IN 46534. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through January 10, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CENTERION HEALTH SERVICES, SAVINO, WEXFORD, filed by RYAN SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(LMK) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Centurion Health is a litigant